Severn Trent Plc
5 May 2004
Severn Trent Plc today announced that Alan Perelman will be retiring from the
role of Group Finance Director, effective 31 August 2004, and retiring from the
company on 30th September, 2004. He will be replaced as Group Finance Director
by Mark Wilson, currently Director of Finance and Regulation, Severn Trent
Water, from 1st September, 2004.
The Group also announced that David Arculus would be standing down from the
Board after more than six years as Chairman at the end of December 2004.
Mr Arculus said: 'I would like to thank Alan for his dedicated service to
Severn Trent and wish him well in his retirement'.
'We are fortunate to have Mark Wilson as his replacement. His experience in
Severn Trent Water, and the regulatory review process in particular, will be
invaluable going forward'.
'As for my own position, I believe it will be the right time for me to stand
down at the end of the year. Before then the Board will have appointed my
successor, and a successor to Robert Walker who retires as Group Chief
Executive in February 2005, and the water regulatory review process should have
been substantially completed'.
For further information contact:
Peter Gavan
Director of Corporate Affairs
Severn Trent Plc
0121 722 4310
Footnote:
Mark Wilson, aged 46, joined Severn Trent Water as Director of Finance and
Regulation in 1995. Previously he had worked for Arthur Andersen both in London
and Hong Kong and International Leisure Group. Born in Ilford, Essex, he
graduated from University College, Bangor. He became a member of the Institute
of Chartered Accountants in 1983.
Ends
*A Private Investor is a recipient of the information who meets all of the conditions set out below, the recipient:
Obtains access to the information in a personal capacity;
Is not required to be regulated or supervised by a body concerned with the regulation or supervision of investment or financial services;
Is not currently registered or qualified as a professional securities trader or investment adviser with any national or state exchange, regulatory authority, professional association or recognised professional body;
Does not currently act in any capacity as an investment adviser, whether or not they have at some time been qualified to do so;
Uses the information solely in relation to the management of their personal funds and not as a trader to the public or for the investment of corporate funds;
Does not distribute, republish or otherwise provide any information or derived works to any third party in any manner or use or process information or derived works for any commercial purposes.
Please note, this site uses cookies. Some of the cookies are essential for parts of the site to operate and have already been set. You may delete and block all cookies from this site, but if you do, parts of the site may not work. To find out more about the cookies used on Investegate and how you can manage them, see our Privacy and Cookie Policy
To continue using Investegate, please confirm that you are a private investor as well as agreeing to our Privacy and Cookie Policy & Terms.